NY A08382 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - print number 8382a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-15 - print number 8382a
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that limited permits to practice medicine may be renewed biennially; expands the types of facilities where permitees may practice; authorizes permits to be renewed at the discretion of the department of education; provides that such department shall not deny a limited permit based solely on the previous number of authorizations of such permits issued to the applicant.
Title
Provides that limited permits to practice medicine may be renewed biennially; expands the types of facilities where permitees may practice; authorizes permits to be renewed at the discretion of the department of education; provides that such department shall not deny a limited permit based solely on the previous number of authorizations of such permits issued to the applicant.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Assembly | print number 8382a |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07002 (Same As) 2024-04-30 - PRINT NUMBER 7002B