NY A08379 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.335
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-11 - signed chap.335
Summary
Authorizes the town of Marcellus to purchase the fire barn and equipment located outside the village of Marcellus.
Title
Authorizes the town of Marcellus to purchase the fire barn and equipment located outside the village of Marcellus.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-11 | signed chap.335 | |
2009-07-31 | delivered to governor | |
2009-07-16 | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY | |
2009-07-16 | PASSED SENATE | |
2009-07-16 | HOME RULE REQUEST | |
2009-07-16 | 3RD READING CAL.812 | |
2009-07-16 | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5506A | |
2009-06-22 | REFERRED TO RULES | |
2009-06-22 | delivered to senate | |
2009-06-22 | passed assembly | |
2009-06-22 | home rule request | |
2009-06-22 | home rule request | |
2009-06-22 | ordered to third reading rules cal.552 | |
2009-06-22 | rules report cal.552 | |
2009-06-22 | reported | |
2009-06-22 | reported referred to rules | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-01 | print number 8379a | |
2009-06-01 | amend and recommit to local governments | |
2009-05-18 | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S05506 (Same As) 2009-08-11 - signed chap.335
New York State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08379&term=2009&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y |