NY A08349 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - print number 8349a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-16 - print number 8349a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the psilocybin assisted therapy pilot program; provides such program will be offered to ten thousand veterans and first responders from the western region of New York state.
Title
Establishes the psilocybin assisted therapy pilot program; provides such program will be offered to ten thousand veterans and first responders from the western region of New York state.
Sponsors
Asm. Patrick Burke [D] | Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Andrew Hevesi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Assembly | print number 8349a |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-12-13 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07832 (Same As) 2024-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 7832A