NY A08321 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - substituted by s6542b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-01 - substituted by s6542b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words fireman or policeman with the words firefighter or police officer or variation thereof.
Title
Relates to replacing all instances of the words or variations of the words fireman or policeman with the words firefighter or police officer or variation thereof.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-01 | Assembly | substituted by s6542b |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 8321c |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.601 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.684 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.684 |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-06-21 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | print number 8321b |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8321a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2017-06-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06542 (Same As) 2018-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.476