NY A08317 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-11 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes the attacks on September 11, 2001 in courses of instruction in patriotism and citizenship; provides that such courses may include using educational resources provided by national and accredited institutions that are recommended for priority use.
Title
Includes the attacks on September 11, 2001 in courses of instruction in patriotism and citizenship; provides that such courses may include using educational resources provided by national and accredited institutions that are recommended for priority use.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
2021-10-20 | Assembly | referred to education |