NY A08310 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-05 - substituted by s7744d
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires retailers to affix a notice on any bicycles with electric assist and micromobility devices which states to always yield to pedestrians and follow traffic laws that you cannot use such device on sidewalks or on highways, except where allowed by local law; authorizes the department of state to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; imposes fines for violations thereof; makes related provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires retailers to affix a notice on any bicycles with electric assist and micromobility devices which states to always yield to pedestrians and follow traffic laws that you cannot use such device on sidewalks or on highways, except where allowed by local law; authorizes the department of state to promulgate necessary rules and regulations; imposes fines for violations thereof; makes related provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-05Assemblysubstituted by s7744d
2024-05-30Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.255
2024-05-30Assemblyrules report cal.255
2024-05-30Assemblyreported
2024-05-23Assemblyamend and recommit to rules 8310c
2024-05-22Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2024-05-03Assemblyprint number 8310b
2024-05-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2024-01-22Assemblyprint number 8310a
2024-01-22Assemblyamend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection
2023-11-27Assemblyreferred to consumer affairs and protection

Same As/Similar To

S07744 (Same As) 2024-07-11 - SIGNED CHAP.202

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A8310
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08310
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08310A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08310B
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08310C
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08310&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3

Bill Comments

feedback