NY A08310 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 17 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-01 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes certain provisions applicable to public schools relating to instruction in civility, citizenship and character education.
Title
Makes certain provisions applicable to public schools relating to instruction in civility, citizenship and character education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-01 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-03-01 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.290 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.422 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.422 |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05834 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION