NY A08288 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - signed chap.67
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to impose an additional one-half of one percent sales tax to be used for the support of education.
Title
Authorizes the city of Yonkers to impose an additional one-half of one percent sales tax to be used for the support of education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | Senate | signed chap.67 |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2015-06-25 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2015-06-25 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2015-06-25 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1918 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | home rule request |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.746 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.746 |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | print number 8288a |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05993 (Same As) 2015-06-18 - PRINT NUMBER 5993A