NY A08268 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Suffolk county to regulate taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Title
Authorizes Suffolk county to regulate taxicabs, limousines, and livery vehicles.
Sponsors
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Senate | signed chap.382 |
2012-08-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | HOME RULE REQUEST |
2012-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1225 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6366A |
2012-06-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | home rule request |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.97 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | rules report cal.97 |
2012-06-11 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | print number 8268a |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to local governments |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2011-06-09 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06366 (Same As) 2012-06-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8268A