NY A08237 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-2)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires medical assistance managed care providers to provide coverage for medically necessary prescription drugs and medical supplies.
Title
Requires medical assistance managed care providers to provide coverage for medically necessary prescription drugs and medical supplies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | print number 8237c |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to health |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8237b |
2011-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | print number 8237a |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2011-06-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05646 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - REFERRED TO HEALTH