NY A08234 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on August 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the governor from granting himself or herself or any person involved with furthering the illegal conduct of the governor a reprieve, commutation or pardon.
Title
Prohibits the governor from granting himself or herself or any person involved with furthering the illegal conduct of the governor a reprieve, commutation or pardon.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2021-11-10 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2021-09-17 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2021-08-25 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S07329 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY