NY A08186 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-11 - signed chap.254
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland to the Coleman Country Day Camp and Coleson Properties, LLC for fair market value.
Title
Authorizes the alienation of certain parklands in the county of Nassau and the sale of such parkland to the Coleman Country Day Camp and Coleson Properties, LLC for fair market value.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-16 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-11 | Senate | signed chap.254 |
2020-10-30 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2020-07-22 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-07-22 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2020-07-22 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.791 |
2020-07-22 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6371A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | home rule request |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.176 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.176 |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-07-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | print number 8186b |
2020-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8186a |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to local governments |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S06371 (Same As) 2020-11-11 - signed chap.254