NY A08179 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-09-23 - signed chap.536
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to restricting duties which may be assigned to specialist's assistants in radiology.
Title
Relates to restricting duties which may be assigned to specialist's assistants in radiology.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.536 |
2011-09-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2011-06-20 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2011-06-20 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2011-06-20 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.830 |
2011-06-20 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5395 |
2011-06-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.293 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.293 |
2011-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05395 (Same As) 2011-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8179