NY A08171 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-03 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to replacing the term intellectually disabled with developmentally disabled; and relates to guardianship and health care decisions of persons with developmental disabilities.
Title
Relates to replacing the term intellectually disabled with developmentally disabled; and relates to guardianship and health care decisions of persons with developmental disabilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | print number 8171a |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2017-06-07 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |