NY A08160 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-27 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
This bill provides that participants in subsidized public sector employ- ment programs such as the Work Experience Program (WEP) shall have substantially the same status under the Taylor Law as other employees.
Title
Provides that participants in subsidized public sector employment programs shall have substantially the same status under the Public Employees' Fair Employment Act (Taylor law) as employees of the sponsoring social services district or the department of family assistance, as the case may be; provides for rules and regulations to implement these provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-27 | enacting clause stricken | |
2010-01-06 | referred to governmental employees | |
2009-05-06 | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S6627 (Same As) 2010-01-21 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS