NY A08111 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - print number 8111a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - print number 8111a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the customized employment demonstration program whereby certain positions are divided into sub-positions by the civil service commission to provide for employment of persons with developmental disabilities who are able to perform a portion of the duties of such position.
Title
Establishes the customized employment demonstration program whereby certain positions are divided into sub-positions by the civil service commission to provide for employment of persons with developmental disabilities who are able to perform a portion of the duties of such position.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | print number 8111a |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05805 (Same As) 2016-02-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5805A