NY A08096 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5830
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Yeshiva of South Shore in the town of Hempstead, in the county of Nassau, to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Title
Authorizes Yeshiva of South Shore in the town of Hempstead, in the county of Nassau, to apply for a retroactive real property tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5830 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.591 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.591 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05830 (Same As) 2015-09-25 - SIGNED CHAP.357