NY A08087 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a process for the commissioner to authorize transfer of patients in mental health facilities upon a verdict of not responsible by reason of mental disease or defect, to a foreign nation upon request.
Title
Provides a process for the commissioner to authorize transfer of patients in mental health facilities upon a verdict of not responsible by reason of mental disease or defect, to a foreign nation upon request.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-13 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.306 |
2019-09-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8087 |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to codes |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1361 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6164A |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | REFERRED TO MENTAL HEALTH AND DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6164a |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.421 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.421 |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06164 (Same As) 2019-09-13 - SIGNED CHAP.306