NY A08087 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5004a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-17 - substituted by s5004a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions relating to the taking of fish, shellfish, and crustacea in special management areas.
Title
Extends provisions relating to the taking of fish, shellfish, and crustacea in special management areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Assembly | substituted by s5004a |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.444 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.444 |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8087a |
2015-06-09 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05004 (Same As) 2015-08-13 - SIGNED CHAP.200