NY A08075 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5431a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 5 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5431a
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a tax credit for donation of wholesome food to a food bank or other emergency food program by eligible New York state farmers.
Title
Relates to a tax credit for donation of wholesome food to a food bank or other emergency food program by eligible New York state farmers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5431a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.590 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.590 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05431 (Same As) 2015-12-11 - VETOED MEMO.299