NY A08057 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-21 - signed chap.406
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to the qualifications of fire chiefs in any fire department, fire district or fire protection district that employs fewer than five paid firefighters.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to the qualifications of fire chiefs in any fire department, fire district or fire protection district that employs fewer than five paid firefighters.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 88 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-12-21Senatesigned chap.406
2018-12-11Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-20SenateORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.2085
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-04-16Assemblyamended on third reading (t) 8057b
2018-01-03Assemblyordered to third reading cal.576
2018-01-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-01-03SenateDIED IN SENATE
2017-06-21SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2017-06-21Assemblydelivered to senate
2017-06-21Assemblypassed assembly
2017-06-15Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.417
2017-06-15Assemblyrules report cal.417
2017-06-15Assemblyreported
2017-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2017-06-13Assemblyprint number 8057a
2017-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to governmental employees
2017-05-25Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S06242 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08057
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08057A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A08057B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A08057&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A8057#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback