NY A08042 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-21 - signed chap.211
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to approving a certain agreement for a payment in lieu of taxes.
Title
Relates to approving a certain agreement for a payment in lieu of taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-21 | Senate | signed chap.211 |
2017-08-09 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2017-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2017-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1921 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6411 |
2017-06-19 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2017-06-19 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.416 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | rules report cal.416 |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | reported |
2017-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06411 (Same As) 2017-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8042