NY A08038 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-08 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.
Title
Permits consent for service in the form of magnetic tape or through electronic means for certain collection procedures by the sheriff's office or an officer or employee of the department of taxation and finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | print number 8038a |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S05881 (Same As) 2020-03-03 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE