NY A08031 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.284
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.284
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands which judges may solemnize a marriage to include all federal circuit court of appeals judges and all federal district court judges.
Title
Expands which judges may solemnize a marriage to include all federal circuit court of appeals judges and all federal district court judges.
Sponsors
Asm. Jamie Romeo [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.284 |
2019-12-20 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-18 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-18 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-18 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | substituted for a8031a |
2019-06-13 | Senate | referred to judiciary |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1372 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6330A |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2019-06-05 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s6330a |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.299 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.299 |
2019-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to rules 8031a |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S06330 (Same As) 2019-12-20 - VETOED MEMO.284