NY A08000 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 8000b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-23 - print number 8000b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Adirondack Medical Center to operate a part-time off-campus emergency department in the town of North Elba, county of Essex.
Title
Authorizes the Adirondack Medical Center to operate a part-time off-campus emergency department in the town of North Elba, county of Essex.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-23 | Assembly | print number 8000b |
2014-01-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | print number 8000a |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2013-06-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05764 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - PRINT NUMBER 5764B