NY A07994 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on December 16 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-16 - signed chap.695
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enforce the requirement for certification of carriers of household goods by motor vehicle.
Title
Authorizes the attorney general to seek an injunction to enforce the requirement for certification of carriers of household goods by motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-16 | Assembly | signed chap.695 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.910 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7127A |
2022-03-28 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-28 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.501 |
2022-03-22 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-15 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | print number 7994a |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
2021-06-04 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07127 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7994A