NY A07980 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5812a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-18 - substituted by s5812a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to authorizing the city of Poughkeepsie to sell certain parklands to a private entity for a public benefit and economic development.
Title
Relates to authorizing the city of Poughkeepsie to sell certain parklands to a private entity for a public benefit and economic development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-18 | Assembly | substituted by s5812a |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.629 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | rules report cal.629 |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported |
2015-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2015-06-16 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | print number 7980a |
2015-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to cities |
2015-06-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S05812 (Same As) 2015-10-26 - SIGNED CHAP.408