NY A07952 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s9288
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the description of lands for which the Commissioner of General Services is authorized to grant an easement to the Central Hudson Gas and Electric Corporation.
Title
Relates to the description of lands for which the Commissioner of General Services is authorized to grant an easement to the Central Hudson Gas and Electric Corporation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s9288 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.541 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-06-08 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S09288 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.475