NY A07939 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - reported referred to rules
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that the legislative body of the county of Westchester shall fix the fee to be charged for a license to carry or possess a pistol or revolver and provide for the disposition of such fees.
Title
Provides that the legislative body of the county of Westchester shall fix the fee to be charged for a license to carry or possess a pistol or revolver and provide for the disposition of such fees.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-17 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | referred to codes |
Same As/Similar To
S06659 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - referred to ways and means