NY A07938 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 66-0)
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - print number 7938a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 1 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-24 - print number 7938a
Pending: Assembly Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes application of the property tax abatement for rent-controlled or rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens or disabled persons, to those units occupied by tenants paying the maximum allowable rent when such rent exceeds 1/2 of the household income; provides for state payments to cities affected thereby equal to 10% of lost real property tax revenue.
Title
Authorizes application of the property tax abatement for rent-controlled or rent regulated properties occupied by senior citizens or disabled persons, to those units occupied by tenants paying the maximum allowable rent when such rent exceeds 1/2 of the household income; provides for state payments to cities affected thereby equal to 10% of lost real property tax revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-24 | Assembly | print number 7938a |
2016-03-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to aging |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to aging |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S05056 (Same As) 2016-04-11 - referred to aging