NY A07904 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 7904a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 19 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-27 - print number 7904a
Pending: Assembly Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires disclosure of the use of artificial intelligence in political communications; directs the state board of elections to create criteria for determining whether a political communication contains an image or video footage created through generative artificial intelligence and to create a definition of content generated by artificial intelligence.
Title
Requires disclosure of the use of artificial intelligence in political communications; directs the state board of elections to create criteria for determining whether a political communication contains an image or video footage created through generative artificial intelligence and to create a definition of content generated by artificial intelligence.
Sponsors
Asm. Clyde Vanel [D] | Asm. Alicia Hyndman [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Chantel Jackson [D] |
Asm. John Zaccaro [D] | Asm. Amanda Septimo [D] | Asm. Deborah Glick [D] | Asm. Dana Levenberg [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-27 | Assembly | print number 7904a |
2024-02-27 | Assembly | amend and recommit to election law |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to election law |
2023-07-19 | Assembly | referred to election law |
Same As/Similar To
S07592 (Same As) 2024-02-26 - PRINT NUMBER 7592A