NY A07884 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-10 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Title
Requires the department to review laws and policies pertaining to free or reduced cost hunting and fishing licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S07758 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means