NY A07854 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s6925a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-24 - substituted by s6925a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides the International Boxing Hall of Fame the option to purchase the reverter interest of certain lands conveyed by the New York state thruway authority.
Title
Provides the International Boxing Hall of Fame the option to purchase the reverter interest of certain lands conveyed by the New York state thruway authority.
Sponsors
Asm. John Salka [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted by s6925a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | rules report cal.408 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 7854a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-05-28 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06925 (Same As) 2022-07-21 - SIGNED CHAP.445