NY A07854 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-06 - referred to health
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Offer comprehensive publicly-sponsored health coverage to all New Yorkers
Title
Establishes New York Health Plus to provide comprehensive health coverage to all New Yorkers; provides for a phase-in period for such program and requires the governor to submit a financing plan to include assessments on employers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-06 | referred to health | |
2009-06-15 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-02 | reported referred to codes | |
2009-04-27 | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S04884 (Same As) 2010-01-06 - REFERRED TO HEALTH