NY A07848 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - print number 7848a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-24 - print number 7848a
Pending: Assembly Corporations, Authorities and Commissions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides a permit for a memorial lands facility.
Title
Provides a permit for a memorial lands facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-24 | Assembly | print number 7848a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amend and recommit to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
2021-05-27 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06842 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - referred to corporations, authorities and commissions