NY A07833 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - print number 7833a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-13 - print number 7833a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the disability retirement for safety and security officers.
Title
Relates to the disability retirement for safety and security officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-13 | Assembly | print number 7833a |
2022-01-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08918 (Same As) 2022-04-28 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS