NY A07812 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes emergency medical care personnel to provide basic first aid to dogs and cats.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 124 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-19Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-19Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-19Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.313
2018-06-19Assemblyrules report cal.313
2018-06-19Assemblyreported
2018-06-14Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-13Assemblyprint number 7812b
2018-06-13Assemblyamend and recommit to codes
2018-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2018-05-08Assemblyprint number 7812a
2018-05-08Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to higher education
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to higher education
2017-05-16Assemblyreferred to higher education

Same As/Similar To

S05716 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 5716B

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07812
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07812A
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07812B
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07812&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1

Bill Comments

feedback