NY A07748 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - rules report cal.569
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - rules report cal.569
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "climate change property tax relief act"; provides assessment relief to property owners within eligible municipalities; relates to payments of real property tax refunds and credits as a result of participating in the climate change property tax relief act.
Title
Enacts the "climate change property tax relief act"; provides assessment relief to property owners within eligible municipalities; relates to payments of real property tax refunds and credits as a result of participating in the climate change property tax relief act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.569 |
2024-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | print number 7748b |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | print number 7748a |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to real property taxation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07515 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - returned to senate