NY A07714 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - delivered to secretary of state
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases the amount from $25,000 to $50,000 for actions and proceedings in the New York city civil court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases the amount from $25,000 to $50,000 for actions and proceedings in the New York city civil court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13Assemblydelivered to secretary of state
2019-06-20SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2019-06-20SenatePASSED SENATE
2019-06-20Senate3RD READING CAL.1832
2019-06-20SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6346
2019-06-11Senateopinion referred to judiciary
2019-06-06SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2019-06-06Assemblydelivered to senate
2019-06-06Assemblypassed assembly
2019-05-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.571
2019-05-30Assemblyreported
2019-05-23Assemblyto attorney-general for opinion
2019-05-17Assemblyreferred to judiciary

Same As/Similar To

S06346 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7714

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback