NY A07707 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s5255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-20 - substituted by s5255
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the village of Roslyn to accept an application for an exemption of property taxes for the parcels located at lots 1199-1200 of block 106 of section 7 on the Nassau County Land and Tax Map.
Title
Authorizes the village of Roslyn to accept an application for an exemption of property taxes for the parcels located at lots 1199-1200 of block 106 of section 7 on the Nassau County Land and Tax Map.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s5255 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.554 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.554 |
2013-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2013-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S05255 (Same As) 2013-10-21 - SIGNED CHAP.405