NY A07689 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - signed chap.223
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits certain practices concerning or consideration for referrals by providers of substance use disorder services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits certain practices concerning or consideration for referrals by providers of substance use disorder services.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Alcoholism And Drug Abuse Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24Senatesigned chap.223
2018-08-13Assemblydelivered to governor
2018-06-18SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2018-06-18SenatePASSED SENATE
2018-06-18Senate3RD READING CAL.251
2018-06-18SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S6544B
2018-06-14SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2018-06-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2018-06-14Assemblypassed assembly
2018-06-13Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.160
2018-06-13Assemblyrules report cal.160
2018-06-13Assemblyreported
2018-06-11Assemblyreported referred to rules
2018-06-05Assemblyprint number 7689a
2018-06-05Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to codes
2018-01-03Assemblyreferred to codes
2017-06-07Assemblyreported referred to codes
2017-05-09Assemblyreferred to alcoholism and drug abuse

Same As/Similar To

S06544 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7689A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07689
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A07689A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC3
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A07689&term=2017&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2017/A7689#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback