NY A07670 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s7062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-07 - substituted by s7062
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.
Title
Makes permanent recertification of persons providing emergency medical care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7062 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.501 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07062 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.233