NY A07629 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7629a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-01 - print number 7629a
Pending: Assembly Governmental Employees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Grants service credit to members of the uniformed correction force of the New York city department of correction covered by provisions of law for over 25 years.
Title
Grants service credit to members of the uniformed correction force of the New York city department of correction covered by provisions of law for over 25 years.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-01 | Assembly | print number 7629a |
2020-07-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
2019-05-14 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S05435 (Same As) 2020-04-08 - PRINT NUMBER 5435A