NY A07599 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-23 - signed chap.751
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the secondary enforcement of certain motor vehicle equipment violations; prohibits enforcement of such violations in absence of reasonable cause to believe the operator of such motor vehicle has violated another provision of law.
Title
Relates to the secondary enforcement of certain motor vehicle equipment violations; prohibits enforcement of such violations in absence of reasonable cause to believe the operator of such motor vehicle has violated another provision of law.
Sponsors
Asm. Taylor Darling [D] | Asm. William Magnarelli [D] | Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Stefani Zinerman [D] |
Asm. Charles Barron [D] | Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 16 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 23 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-23 | Assembly | signed chap.751 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.417 |
2022-05-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7353 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-10 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.256 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.486 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.486 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S07353 (Same As) 2022-05-18 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7599