NY A07575 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-03 - ordered to third reading cal.529
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the failure to provide notice of a default judgment.
Title
Relates to the failure to provide notice of a default judgment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.529 |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.558 |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | reported |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2017-05-02 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05799 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - COMMITTED TO RULES