NY A07565 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6818
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-02 - substituted by s6818
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners.
Title
Extends authorization for certain health care professionals licensed to practice in other jurisdictions to practice in this state in connection with an event sanctioned by New York Road Runners.
Sponsors
Asm. Sarah Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | substituted by s6818 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.263 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.263 |
2021-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2021-05-13 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S06818 (Same As) 2021-07-01 - SIGNED CHAP.230