NY A07553 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - print number 7553a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Provides that such rates of payment shall be updated to reflect the most current mean price for free-standing residential health care facilities with less than three hundred beds each time that the cost basis of residential health care facility rates is updated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides that such rates of payment shall be updated to reflect the most current mean price for free-standing residential health care facilities with less than three hundred beds each time that the cost basis of residential health care facility rates is updated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-16Assemblyprint number 7553a
2024-05-16Assemblyamend and recommit to health
2024-01-03Assemblyreferred to health
2023-05-25Assemblyreferred to health

Same As/Similar To

S07248 (Same As) 2024-05-22 - PRINT NUMBER 7248A

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback