NY A07546 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 7546a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - print number 7546a
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the commissioner of health to develop a sustainability plan for the state university of New York downstate medical center; provides that such sustainability plan shall not limit or alter the rights of employees pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement.
Title
Requires the commissioner of health to develop a sustainability plan for the state university of New York downstate medical center; provides that such sustainability plan shall not limit or alter the rights of employees pursuant to a collective bargaining agreement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Assembly | print number 7546a |
2024-02-29 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to health |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S06956 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 6956A