NY A07502 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-18 - signed chap.119
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits dangerous practices at companion animal grooming facilities; provides that no heating elements in cage or box dryers shall be turned on; provides that any violation shall be punishable of a fine between $250-$500.
Title
Prohibits dangerous practices at companion animal grooming facilities; provides that no heating elements in cage or box dryers shall be turned on; provides that any violation shall be punishable of a fine between $250-$500.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-18 | Senate | signed chap.119 |
2012-07-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1059 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5702A |
2012-03-19 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO AGRICULTURE |
2012-03-19 | Senate | returned to senate |
2012-03-19 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7502b |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2012-03-05 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-03-05 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2012-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.250 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-06-24 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO RULES |
2011-06-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTION RECONSIDERED |
2011-06-23 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1541 |
2011-06-23 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5702 |
2011-06-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.188 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | rules report cal.188 |
2011-06-14 | Assembly | reported |
2011-06-13 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2011-06-06 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | print number 7502a |
2011-06-01 | Assembly | amend and recommit to agriculture |
2011-05-06 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S05702 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7502A