NY A07477 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - advanced to third reading cal.443
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to conflicts of interest of municipal officers and employees, codes of ethics and boards of ethics; permits local codes of ethics to prohibit activities expressly permitted by article 18 of the general municipal law.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to conflicts of interest of municipal officers and employees, codes of ethics and boards of ethics; permits local codes of ethics to prohibit activities expressly permitted by article 18 of the general municipal law.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Local Governments Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.443
2019-05-21Assemblyreported
2019-05-14Assemblyreported referred to codes
2019-05-06Assemblyreferred to local governments

Same As/Similar To

S05548 (Same As) 2019-05-06 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback